U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 18, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Payment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • February 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.