U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 26, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • July 26, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 16, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • October 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 16, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 14, 2020: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 06, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 05, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 05, 2016: [Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 02, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 02, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 30, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 30, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 30, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 30, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • June 30, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • February 01, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • February 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 01, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.