U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 14, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 25, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.