U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 24, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Seal]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • May 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 01, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • February 02, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 01, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.