U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sierra
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Continue ]
  • December 11, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • June 08, 2016: [Travel ]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • February 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 02, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • February 02, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 01, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Information (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.