U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cipriano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 11, 2018: [Sealed Document]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2018: [Seal]
  • March 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2016
  • February 03, 2016: [Instrument Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.