U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Writ Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Sealed Document]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 12, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 30, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 30, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • July 25, 2019: [USM Return Unexecuted]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 10, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 26, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 26, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • August 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 15, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 20, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 16, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 05, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • February 04, 2016: [Bond]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.