U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Donaldson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • February 12, 2016: [Appear]
  • February 11, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 09, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 09, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • February 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 05, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.