U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sharkany
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Reply to Response]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [Reopen Case]
  • March 30, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Sealed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.