U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bates
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 16, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 23, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 24, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • February 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 08, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Add Counts]
  • February 08, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 08, 2016: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.