U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Golia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 01, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 24, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 24, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 09, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.