U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Sealed Document]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 07, 2020: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 07, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 07, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 07, 2020: [Dismiss ]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 12, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 24, 2019: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 18, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • August 02, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.