U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jeffrey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • November 09, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 31, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 14, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 14, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 13, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 11, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 04, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 17, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2016: [Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • March 29, 2016: [Bond]
  • March 28, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 28, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Bond]
  • March 28, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • March 28, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.