U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 12, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • January 23, 2018: [Passport Returned]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • January 17, 2018: [Return of Passport]
May, 2017
  • May 06, 2017: [Transcript]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 07, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 07, 2016: [Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • November 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Exhibit]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 20, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 27, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • April 27, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 27, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • April 27, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 27, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.