U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-21124
  • Case Name: Hubert James Singleton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 01, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 11, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Reassign Judge]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • August 10, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Debtor's Certification Re Financial Management Course Completion]
  • August 08, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Document]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [none]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Form 122]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Form 122]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Boscarino, Thomas C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 12, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.