U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandella
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 18, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 18, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 22, 2016: [Letter]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 18, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • September 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 16, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 16, 2016: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.