U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paulino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Reply to Response]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 08, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 08, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 03, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 11, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 11, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 05, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • May 04, 2017: [Payment]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 08, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 04, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2016: [Status Conference]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 25, 2016: [Suppress]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 26, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 22, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 22, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.