U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Transcript]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [USM Return Unexecuted]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 26, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 25, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • May 25, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 20, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • January 20, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • January 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 20, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • October 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 28, 2016: [Indictment]
  • September 27, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.