U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bellofiore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 17, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2016
  • December 26, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2016: [Bond]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 13, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2016: [Consent Form]
  • October 13, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.