U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delgado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continue ]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 28, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • August 28, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Transcript]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 01, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 01, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 02, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • October 31, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.