U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horowitz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2018: [Dismiss ]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2016: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • November 10, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2016: [Pretrial Diversion Waiver]
  • November 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2016: [Seal Case]
  • November 09, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 09, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.