U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00198-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sparks et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 12, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Exhibit]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 17, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 06, 2020: [Witness List]
  • August 06, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 06, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause ]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 03, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 24, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 17, 2020: [Transcript]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Transcript]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 12, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • March 01, 2020: [Unseal Document]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • February 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 12, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • January 23, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • January 17, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 24, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 15, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 19, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 14, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Inspect]
  • June 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 09, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 06, 2019: [Transcript]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 24, 2019: [Inspect]
  • April 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Travel ]
  • February 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 02, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 30, 2018: [Travel ]
  • October 29, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 18, 2018: [Receipt for Passport]
  • October 11, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Travel ]
  • September 20, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 30, 2018: [Witness List]
  • August 30, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 29, 2018: [Leave to File]
  • August 20, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 10, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 08, 2018: [Seal]
  • August 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 27, 2018: [Witness List]
  • July 25, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • July 24, 2018: [Compel ]
  • July 10, 2018: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • July 10, 2018: [Jury Verdict]
  • July 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • July 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • July 10, 2018: [New Trial]
  • July 06, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • July 05, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • July 05, 2018: [Acquittal]
  • July 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • July 02, 2018: [Preclude]
  • July 02, 2018: [Jury Trial]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • June 29, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 28, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • June 28, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 26, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 25, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 25, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • June 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • June 22, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 21, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 20, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 19, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • June 19, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 19, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 19, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • June 18, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • June 18, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 15, 2018: [Seal]
  • June 15, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 15, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 14, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • June 14, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 11, 2018: [Jury Trial]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
  • June 10, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 10, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 10, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 09, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • June 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 09, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2018: [Preclude]
  • June 07, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • June 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • June 06, 2018: [Jury Selection]
  • June 06, 2018: [Quash ]
  • June 06, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • June 05, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • June 05, 2018: [Seal]
  • June 05, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • June 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 30, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 30, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 29, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 29, 2018: [Quash ]
  • May 25, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • May 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 22, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 22, 2018: [Leave to File]
  • May 22, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 21, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 21, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 21, 2018: [Quash ]
  • May 21, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 19, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 17, 2018: [Compel ]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Quash ]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 14, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 11, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2018: [Frye Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 02, 2018: [Seal]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 24, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Frye Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Hearing ]
  • March 29, 2018: [Hearing ]
  • March 27, 2018: [Travel ]
  • March 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • February 28, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 28, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 20, 2018: [Continue ]
  • February 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Strike ]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 05, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 05, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Leave to File]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 26, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 26, 2018: [Seal]
  • January 26, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • January 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 25, 2018: [Strike ]
  • January 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [Seal]
  • January 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2018: [Travel ]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Travel ]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 05, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Seal]
  • December 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Bill of Particulars]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • December 01, 2017: [Seal]
  • December 01, 2017: [Extension of Time]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Seal]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 17, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • October 16, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 20, 2017: [Travel ]
  • September 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Discovery]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 05, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2017: [Travel ]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Transcript]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Conflict Hearing]
  • February 24, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2017: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • January 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 04, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 27, 2016: [Travel ]
  • December 21, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 20, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 19, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 19, 2016: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2016: [Discovery]
  • December 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • December 09, 2016: [Bond]
  • December 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 02, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 18, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2016: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • November 17, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2016: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 15, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • November 14, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 14, 2016: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.