U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • April 01, 2019: [Passport Returned]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • March 25, 2019: [Return of Passport]
  • March 04, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 25, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 21, 2019: [Violation Report]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2017: [Receipt for Passport]
  • December 06, 2017: [Receipt for Instrument]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2017: [Bond]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2017: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 17, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • November 08, 2017: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • October 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 26, 2017: [Bond]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 10, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2017: [Court Exhibits]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 05, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • February 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.