U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Claudio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 31, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 29, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 29, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • May 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 22, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 22, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 03, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 29, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [Suppress]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 16, 2017: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 20, 2017: [Bond]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 30, 2017: [Continue ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • March 28, 2017: [Application for Writ]
  • March 20, 2017: [Search Warrant Issued ]
  • March 20, 2017: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 20, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 20, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 20, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 17, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • March 08, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.