U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cipolla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 07, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2017: [Add Counts]
  • June 01, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2017: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.