U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flowers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 31, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 21, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • June 13, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • June 13, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 13, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • June 13, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 13, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.