U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 13, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 13, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 29, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 11, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 16, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 16, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 16, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • June 16, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 14, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • June 14, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.