U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • March 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [2255 Motion Filed]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 26, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 09, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 05, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 13, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 16, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 16, 2018: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 05, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Extension of Time]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • May 29, 2018: [Continue ]
  • May 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 15, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 11, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 31, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 31, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 31, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 31, 2017: [Hearing ]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • June 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 29, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • June 29, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • June 16, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.