U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Westley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 20, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 15, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 03, 2020: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Transcript]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Transcript]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 05, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 04, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 04, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 03, 2020: [Transcript]
  • March 03, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 03, 2020: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 03, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 02, 2020: [Dismiss ]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 27, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 26, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 25, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 19, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 17, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2020: [Order]
  • February 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 13, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 15, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • January 15, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 15, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 14, 2020: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 14, 2020: [Dismiss ]
  • January 03, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 19, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 10, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Findings of Fact]
  • November 14, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • November 14, 2019: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 07, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 06, 2019: [Transcript]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 05, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 05, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • November 01, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 01, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 01, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • November 01, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 31, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 30, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 30, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 30, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 30, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 30, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • October 30, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 28, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 27, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 25, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 25, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 23, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • October 18, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 16, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 10, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 19, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 19, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continue ]
  • September 10, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 30, 2019: [Interim Payment]
  • August 29, 2019: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 28, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 27, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 01, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • July 12, 2019: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • July 11, 2019: [Vacate ]
  • July 11, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • July 05, 2019: [Vacate ]
  • July 05, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • July 03, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • July 01, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • June 25, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • June 24, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 24, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • June 19, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 19, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • June 04, 2019: [Continue ]
  • June 03, 2019: [Extension of Time]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 20, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2019: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 22, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 16, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • March 16, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 08, 2019: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Continue ]
  • February 20, 2019: [Transcript]
  • February 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 15, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • February 13, 2019: [Extension of Time]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 30, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 10, 2018: [Vacate ]
  • December 05, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 29, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • November 21, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 21, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 21, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • November 20, 2018: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • November 05, 2018: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • November 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • October 30, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 29, 2018: [Continue ]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 08, 2018: [Order]
  • October 05, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Seal]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 27, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 26, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 25, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 24, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • September 24, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 12, 2018: [Frye Hearing]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 07, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 05, 2018: [Continue ]
  • September 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Reply to Response]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • May 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2018: [Disclosure ]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 01, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2018: [Suppress]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Suppress]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 25, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 06, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • April 06, 2018: [Suppress]
  • April 06, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 06, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • April 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 23, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2018: [Compel ]
  • March 23, 2018: [Suppress]
  • March 23, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • March 23, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • March 23, 2018: [Sever Defendant]
  • March 21, 2018: [Suppress]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • February 22, 2018: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 21, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • February 20, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 20, 2018: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • February 13, 2018: [Suppress]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Bill of Particulars]
  • October 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 03, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • October 03, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2017: [In Limine ]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • September 21, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 01, 2017: [Exhibit List]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
  • August 24, 2017: [Interim Payment]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • August 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: [Bond]
  • August 21, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 16, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 15, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 15, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • August 15, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 15, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 15, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.