U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 16, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 16, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • April 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 22, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • March 20, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 16, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 16, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • February 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 06, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 02, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • January 02, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 27, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 27, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 27, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • November 22, 2017: [Continue ]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 16, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • November 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 16, 2017: [Continue ]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2017: [Continue ]
  • September 19, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 05, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 05, 2017: [Arraignment]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 24, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 24, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • August 24, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.