U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carrasquillo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 23, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 21, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Conflict Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • June 16, 2022: [Findings of Fact]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • June 10, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • June 09, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • June 08, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 08, 2022: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • June 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Waiver of Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2022: [Conflict Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • February 09, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • January 31, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 23, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2021: [Exhibit]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 22, 2021: [Seal]
  • July 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Seal]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • December 11, 2020: [Seal]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 04, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Continue ]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2020: [Continue ]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 11, 2020: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2020: [Continue ]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • November 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Status Report]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • January 23, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Status Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 23, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Continue ]
  • July 10, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 06, 2018: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 26, 2018: [Continue ]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 16, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 13, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.