U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00221-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villarreal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2019: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 20, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Dismiss ]
  • May 17, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 15, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • May 01, 2019: [Continue ]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Continue ]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Continue ]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 05, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 13, 2018: [Continue ]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 19, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continue ]
  • December 04, 2017: [Status Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 10, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2017: [Continue ]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 27, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • September 27, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.