U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00219-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Likaxhiu
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 28, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Add Counts]
  • September 27, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 27, 2017: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.