U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tepan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 26, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 23, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 05, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Transcript]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 29, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • November 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 29, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order Referring Plea]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • September 28, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.