U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 26, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 15, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 30, 2018: [Seal]
  • May 18, 2018: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Continue ]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 12, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 04, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • September 28, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.