U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 02, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 02, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • May 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • May 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 27, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 27, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 13, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 02, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bond]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.