U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kehayias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 23, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 23, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 21, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 09, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 15, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • December 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bond]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.