U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Devine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 07, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 06, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 06, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 07, 2018: [Continue ]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 30, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 30, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 21, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • March 09, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 09, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 04, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2017: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2017: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.