U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kinney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 28, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 03, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • September 01, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2021
  • April 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 30, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • September 28, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 19, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 25, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 10, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 10, 2018: [Seal]
  • January 10, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 08, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2018: [Exhibit]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • January 02, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 19, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 19, 2017: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 05, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Waiver/Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 05, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.