U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 27, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 27, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 27, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 23, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 06, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 06, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 30, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 06, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 06, 2017: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • October 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • October 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 06, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • October 06, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • October 06, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.