U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baptiste
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 12, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • November 12, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 06, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 05, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 03, 2018: [Violation Report]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 28, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • November 27, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Add Counts]
  • October 10, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • October 10, 2017: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.