U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCarthy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Returning Submission]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Returning Submission]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 02, 2021: [Seal]
  • September 02, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Returning Submission]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Returning Submission]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Returning Submission]
  • February 04, 2021: [Continue ]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order Returning Submission]
  • December 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Continue ]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Returning Submission]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Continue ]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order Returning Submission]
  • July 20, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 19, 2020: [Continue ]
  • June 19, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 18, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 18, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice]
  • June 17, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • June 04, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • April 06, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • April 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 03, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 07, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Transcript]
  • January 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 02, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 20, 2018: [Seal]
  • December 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 20, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Continue ]
  • October 22, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 22, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • May 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2018: [Competency Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Writ Issued]
  • February 07, 2018: [Status Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 17, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Returning Submission]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Returning Submission]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 19, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 27, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • October 23, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.