U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quiroz-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Transcript]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
  • June 18, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • June 18, 2019: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 13, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 12, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 04, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Extension of Time]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • March 11, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 03, 2019: [In Limine ]
  • January 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • December 27, 2018: [Leave to File]
  • December 26, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 21, 2018: [Leave to File]
  • December 15, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • December 15, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • December 15, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 15, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2018: [Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2018: [In Limine ]
  • December 14, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • December 14, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 30, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • November 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Reply to Response]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • August 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Suppress]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 07, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order Referring Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2018
  • March 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Document]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 27, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 27, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 26, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • October 23, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 13, 2017: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • October 13, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.