U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2018: [Continue ]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 08, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 05, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2018: [Violation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 21, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 06, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 31, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • October 31, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 17, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.