U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGilvary
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 08, 2017: [Seal]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 17, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.