open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:18-cr-00311-1
    Party Name:USA v. Spear-Zuleta et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Passport]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal ]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody ]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply/Response Misc]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine ]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Surety Information Sheet]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Information Sheet]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USM Return Executed]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?129937
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =