Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:18-cr-00225-1
    Party Name:USA v. Luiza DeSteffano et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?128442
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =