Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:19-20043
    Party Name:Charles E Flynn, III and Dana A Haesche Flynn
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Deficiency Notice - Amendment]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Debtor's Certification Re Financial Management Course Completion]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Wage Execution Letter]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Amended Statements]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122 - Means Test]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?293687
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =