open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00036-1
    Party Name:USA v. Szwarc
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USM Return Executed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?131209
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =