open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

CONNECTICUT PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01415
    Party Name:Thaisz v. Falcone et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Update Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed - Prisoner]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USM Service Papers Sent - Prisoner]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Waiver of Service - Prisoner]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Review Order - Prisoner]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135683
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =